ME LD1704 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding Authority over and Oversight of Certified Nursing Assistant Educational Programs
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding Authority over and Oversight of Certified Nursing Assistant Educational Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-781) thereto in concurrence | |
2010-03-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-781) thereto ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-781) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) READ | |
2010-03-26 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-781) thereto. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-781) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) On motion of Representative SUTHERLAND of Chapman, House Amendment "A" (H-781) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) On motion of Representative SUTHERLAND of Chapman, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-736). | |
2010-03-26 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-736) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative PIOTTI of Unity REMOVED. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Alfond of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |