ME LD1776 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Protect Retirement Income
Title
An Act To Protect Retirement Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-03-23 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) | |
2010-03-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) | |
2010-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2010-02-09 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR. |