ME LD1847 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Municipal Cost Components for Unorganized Territory Services To Be Rendered in Fiscal Year 2012-13
Title
An Act To Establish Municipal Cost Components for Unorganized Territory Services To Be Rendered in Fiscal Year 2012-13
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required | |
2012-03-28 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-27 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-804), in concurrence. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-804) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-804) | |
2012-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Courtney of York REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Representative KNIGHT for the Administrator of the Unorganized Territory pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 36, section 1604, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |