ME LD2002 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide Grants to Schools That Contract for Behavioral and Mental Health Services
Title
An Act to Provide Grants to Schools That Contract for Behavioral and Mental Health Services
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Lynn Copeland [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Marc Malon [D] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #427 (Y: 82 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-05-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-765) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-765) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-765) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) was ADOPTED |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) in concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-856). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-856) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 427 (Yeas 82 - Nays 62 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2024-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative DODGE of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-01-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-25 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-05-25 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |