ME LD201 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make Permanent the Ability of Certain Retailers and Distilleries to Sell Liquor for Off-premises Consumption and Cocktails for On-premises Consumption
Title
An Act to Make Permanent the Ability of Certain Retailers and Distilleries to Sell Liquor for Off-premises Consumption and Cocktails for On-premises Consumption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-04-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-19). |
2023-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-19) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |