ME LD2133 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Expand the Use of Career and Technical Education Centers in the Development of the Electrician Workforce
Title
An Act to Expand the Use of Career and Technical Education Centers in the Development of the Electrician Workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-784), in concurrence. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-784). |
2024-02-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-02-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-28 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |