ME LD300 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Increase Child Support Collection by Expanding the New Hire Reporting Requirements
Title
An Act To Increase Child Support Collection by Expanding the New Hire Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Lawrence Bliss [D] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Rep. Michael Carey [D] |
Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Sen. Deborah Pelletier-Simpson [D] | Rep. Charles Priest [D] | Sen. Nancy Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-19 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) | |
2009-05-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-14 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-12 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) | |
2009-05-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-02-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |