ME LD349 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Authorize Arbitration of Property Tax Valuation Disputes
Title
An Act To Authorize Arbitration of Property Tax Valuation Disputes
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. David Hastings [R] | Rep. Gary Knight [R] |
Sen. Douglas Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2009-05-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) On motion of Representative WATSON of Bath, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT | |
2009-04-28 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-02-03 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |