ME LD357 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Court Facilities in York County
Title
An Act Regarding Court Facilities in York County
Sponsors
Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Sen. Robert Foley [R] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] |
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Recede And Concur RC #290 (Y: 42 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Insist RC #307 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #276 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Insist RC #307 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #276 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 290 (Yeas 42 - Nays 94 - Absent 14 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-18 | House | Subsequently, the motion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-273) Report. and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-273) |
2019-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative BABBIDGE of Kennebunk, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-273) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-273) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 276 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook moved to Accept The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |