ME LD416 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for Direct Appeals under the Maine Juvenile Code to the Supreme Judicial Court
Title
An Act To Provide for Direct Appeals under the Maine Juvenile Code to the Supreme Judicial Court
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] |
Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-92), in concurrence. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-92) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-92). |
2015-04-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |