ME LD621 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure That Businesses Do Not Refuse Payment in Person with Cash
Title
An Act to Ensure That Businesses Do Not Refuse Payment in Person with Cash
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Perkins [R] | Rep. Donald Ardell [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Rep. Kimberly Pomerleau [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #326 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #206 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #206 (Y: 76 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 326 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 206 (Yeas 76 - Nays 65 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2023-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |