ME LD691 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Reduce Barriers to Housing by Limiting Tenant Application Fees
Title
An Act to Reduce Barriers to Housing by Limiting Tenant Application Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #265 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-595) in concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-595) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-595). |
2023-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-595) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 265 (Yeas 80 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |