ME LD738 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote the Maine Economy and Support Maine's Sporting Camp Tradition
Title
An Act To Promote the Maine Economy and Support Maine's Sporting Camp Tradition
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Stephen Wood [R] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Rep. John Tuttle [D] | Rep. Michael Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #359 (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #310 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #310 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) READ and ADOPTED thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-305). |
2013-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 359 (Yeas 127 - Nays 10 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-305).. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-305) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Number 310 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |