ME LD786 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Direct the Department of Labor To Work with the Department of Education and Colleges and Universities and Career and Technical Education Centers To Develop a Preapprenticeship Program and Career Ladder for the Direct Care Workforce
Title
An Act To Direct the Department of Labor To Work with the Department of Education and Colleges and Universities and Career and Technical Education Centers To Develop a Preapprenticeship Program and Career Ladder for the Direct Care Workforce
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. John Ducharme [R] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Rep. Shelley Rudnicki [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=786&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0591&item=1&snum=130 |