MI HB4145 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2011
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-27 - Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2011
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; specialty plates for the "Detroit Red Wings", "Detroit Tigers", "Detroit Lions", "Detroit Pistons", and "NASCAR"; create. Amends sec. 811e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811e) & adds secs. 811r, 811s, 811t, 811u & 811v.
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; specialty plates for the "Detroit Red Wings", "Detroit Tigers", "Detroit Lions", "Detroit Pistons", and "NASCAR"; create. Amends sec. 811e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811e) & adds secs. 811r, 811s, 811t, 811u & 811v.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2011 |
2011-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Jud Gilbert |
Same As/Similar To
SB0869 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4145 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4145.htm |