MI HB4190 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned Pa 16'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned Pa 16'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Construction: asbestos; public contracts for asbestos abatement projects; require disclosure of environmental violations. Creates new act.
Title
Construction: asbestos; public contracts for asbestos abatement projects; require disclosure of environmental violations. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 33 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 (Y: 83 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 (Y: 83 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned Pa 16'24 |
2024-03-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/12/2024 11:24 Am |
2024-03-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/12/2024 10:04 Am |
2024-03-05 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/29/2024 02:38 Pm |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 33 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment |
2023-10-31 | House | Transmitted |
2023-10-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 Yeas 83 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2023-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Curtis Vanderwall |