MI HB4766 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Assigned Pa 106'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Assigned Pa 106'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification; require certain mortgage servicing agents to personally meet with mortgagors. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 3206. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4764'13, HB 4765'13, HB 4767'13
Title
Civil procedure; foreclosure; mortgage modification; require certain mortgage servicing agents to personally meet with mortgagors. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 3206. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4764'13, HB 4765'13, HB 4767'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 106'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2013 @ 4:23 Pm |
2013-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/3/2013 @ 11:56 Am |
2013-07-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/26/2013 @ 10:58 Am |
2013-06-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmitted |
2013-06-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 Yeas 99 Nays 8 |
2013-06-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-06-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-06-13 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2013-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-05-28 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Callton |
Same As/Similar To
SB0382 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services