MI SB0382 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; foreclosure; federal loss mitigation procedures; require lenders to comply. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 3206. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4764'13, HB 4765'13, HB 4767'13, SB 0380'13, SB 0381'13, SB 0383'13
Title
Civil procedure; foreclosure; federal loss mitigation procedures; require lenders to comply. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 3206. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4764'13, HB 4765'13, HB 4767'13, SB 0380'13, SB 0381'13, SB 0383'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 244 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2013-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-11 | House | Received On 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 244 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator James Marleau |
Same As/Similar To
HB4766 (Same As) 2013-07-18 - Assigned Pa 106'13 With Immediate Effect