MI HB5302 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Introduced on September 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-27 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-27 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; other; right to transportation and storage of firearms under certain circumstances; allow. Amends title of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) & adds secs. 1b & 36.
Title
Weapons; other; right to transportation and storage of firearms under certain circumstances; allow. Amends title of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) & adds secs. 1b & 36.
Sponsors
Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. James Bolger [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Rep. Brian Calley [R] |
Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Rep. Michael Lahti [D] | Rep. Richard LeBlanc [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Pete Lund [R] | Rep. Jeff Mayes [D] | Rep. Gary McDowell [D] |
Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Rep. Tim Melton [D] | Rep. Kim Meltzer [R] | Rep. Andy Neumann [D] |
Rep. Paul Opsommer [R] | Rep. Gino Polidori [D] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Dudley Spade [D] |
Rep. John Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-27 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-10-27 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-09-09 | Printed Bill Filed 09/03/2009 | |
2009-09-02 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-09-02 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-02 | Introduced By Representative Paul Opsommer |