MI HB5568 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Communications: internet; high-speed internet office; create. Creates new act.
Title
Communications: internet; high-speed internet office; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Helena Scott [D] | Rep. Mike McFall [D] | Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Regina Weiss [D] |
Rep. Brenda Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Amended |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology |
2024-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Helena Scott |