MI HB5602 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: other; fund for Michigan competes for jobs account; create, and provide oversight within the department of labor and economic opportunity. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.252) & adds sec. 4. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4082'21
Title
Economic development: other; fund for Michigan competes for jobs account; create, and provide oversight within the department of labor and economic opportunity. Amends sec. 2 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.252) & adds sec. 4. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4082'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 592 (Y: 83 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 592 Yeas 83 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-12-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/02/2021 |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |
Subjects
Economic development: other
State agencies (existing): labor and economic opportunity
State financing and management: funds
State agencies (existing): labor and economic opportunity
State financing and management: funds