MI HB5630 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; special; certain language regarding purpose of special education programs and services; modify, and repeal requirement for annual report by state board concerning strict discipline academies. Amends secs. 1711 & 1751 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1711 & 380.1751) & repeals sec. 1311c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311c).
Title
Education; special; certain language regarding purpose of special education programs and services; modify, and repeal requirement for annual report by state board concerning strict discipline academies. Amends secs. 1711 & 1751 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1711 & 380.1751) & repeals sec. 1311c of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1311c).
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Yonker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-05-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/16/2012 |
2012-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Yonker |
Subjects
Education, intermediate school districts
Education, reports
Education, school districts
Education, special
State agencies (existing), education
Education, reports
Education, school districts
Education, special
State agencies (existing), education