MI HB5686 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration; penalties for uses of certain farm-related vehicles that violate certain registration requirements; provide for. Amends secs. 802 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.802 & 257.907). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5802'20
Title
Vehicles: registration; penalties for uses of certain farm-related vehicles that violate certain registration requirements; provide for. Amends secs. 802 & 907 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.802 & 257.907). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5802'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 310 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-07-21 | House | Transmitted |
2020-07-21 | House | Title Amended |
2020-07-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 310 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-07-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-21 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-07-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/17/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |