MI HB5783 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; juries; eligibility to postpone jury service of students; expand to include full-time higher education students. Amends sec. 1335 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1335).
Title
Courts; juries; eligibility to postpone jury service of students; expand to include full-time higher education students. Amends sec. 1335 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1335).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted | |
2010-04-13 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-13 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-02-09 | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-02-04 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced By Representative Mark Meadows |