MI HB5837 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of M-66 between M-55 in Lake City and M-72 in Kalkaska; designate as the "Veterans Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 9a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of M-66 between M-55 in Lake City and M-72 in Kalkaska; designate as the "Veterans Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 9a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 607 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-08 | House | Title Amended |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 607 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/08/2016 |
2016-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2016-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |