MI SB0010 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0031'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0031'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Records: veterans; veteran services boards; allow to hold closed sessions when interviewing veterans' applications for benefits. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268).
Title
Records: veterans; veteran services boards; allow to hold closed sessions when interviewing veterans' applications for benefits. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268).
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 254 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 300 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 300 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0031'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/24/2021 11:00 Am |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/24/2021 08:15 Am |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/10/2021 02:28 Pm |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 254 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2021-06-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 300 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2021-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-10 | House | Received On 02/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Lana Theis |
Subjects
Civil rights: open meetings
Military affairs: other
Records: veterans
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
Military affairs: other
Records: veterans
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs