MI SB0128 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Assigned Pa 0090'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Assigned Pa 0090'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealership requirement for hours of operation; modify. Amends sec. 14 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.14).
Title
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealership requirement for hours of operation; modify. Amends sec. 14 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.14).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 121 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 121 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0090'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2021 02:05 Pm |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/14/2021 08:47 Am |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2021 01:33 Pm |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-09-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-09-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received On 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 121 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly A. Lasata |