MI SB0146 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Pa 0017'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Assigned Pa 0017'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; neighborhood enterprise zones; neighborhood enterprise zone eligibility; expand. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Title
Economic development; neighborhood enterprise zones; neighborhood enterprise zone eligibility; expand. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 459 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 459 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0017'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/25/2014 @ 4:20 Pm |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Approved By Governor 2/25/2014 @ 11:38 Am |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 2/19/2014 @ 3:02 Pm |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2014-02-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-02-04 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 25 Yeas 93 Nays 17 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-01-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-10-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-29 | House | Received On 10/24/2013 |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 459 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Coleman Young |