MI SB0319 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned Pa 0006'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Assigned Pa 0006'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; credit; credit available for certain cell manufacturing facilities; increase, and revise composition of review board. Amends sec. 434 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1434). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4515'09
Title
Michigan business tax; credit; credit available for certain cell manufacturing facilities; increase, and revise composition of review board. Amends sec. 434 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1434). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4515'09
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] | Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Roger Kahn [R] | Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] |
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Bruce Patterson [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] | Sen. Tony Stamas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Assigned Pa 0006'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-21 | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/6/2009 @ 1:06 Pm | |
2009-04-21 | Approved By Governor 4/6/2009 @ 12:07 Pm | |
2009-03-31 | Presented To Governor 3/30/2009 @ 10:18 Am | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-03-26 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-03-26 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-26 | Roll Call # 81 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-26 | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In | |
2009-03-26 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2009-03-25 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 Yeas 104 Nays 4 | |
2009-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-03-10 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-10 | Received On 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Passed Roll Call # 39 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-05 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-03-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-05 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-03-05 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |