MI SB0372 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Assigned Pa 0203'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-01 - Assigned Pa 0203'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; fire personnel; firefighter certification reciprocity; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1966 PA 291 (MCL 29.369).
Title
Law enforcement; fire personnel; firefighter certification reciprocity; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1966 PA 291 (MCL 29.369).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 423 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0203'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2015 @ 2:38 Pm |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/30/2015 @ 1:04 Pm |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/23/2015 @ 1:30 Pm |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-11-10 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-11-10 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development |
2015-10-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-14 | House | Received On 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 423 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |