MI SB0467 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0544'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0544'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; annuities; regulation of annuity sales; provide for. Amends secs. 4151, 4153, 4155 & 4165 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4151 et seq.); adds secs. 4158, 4159, 4160 & 4161 & repeals sec. 4157 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4157).
Title
Insurance; annuities; regulation of annuity sales; provide for. Amends secs. 4151, 4153, 4155 & 4165 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4151 et seq.); adds secs. 4158, 4159, 4160 & 4161 & repeals sec. 4157 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.4157).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1022 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 754 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 754 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 626 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0544'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:42 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:51 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:36 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1022 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 754 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Amended |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2011-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2011 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 626 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |