MI SB0644 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-14 - Assigned Pa 0254'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-14 - Assigned Pa 0254'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; use of 21st century jobs trust fund for new brownfield replacement program; allow. Amends sec. 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.258).
Title
State financing and management; funds; use of 21st century jobs trust fund for new brownfield replacement program; allow. Amends sec. 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.258).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 517 (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 555 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 555 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-14 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0254'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/13/2011 @ 4:04 Pm |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/13/2011 @ 3:29 Pm |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/9/2011 @ 10:51 Am |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2011-11-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-11-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 517 Yeas 96 Nays 10 |
2011-11-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-10-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-10-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-06 | House | Received On 10/06/2011 |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 555 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |