MI SB0859 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; emergency services; protocols that require emergency response vehicles to carry opioid antagonists and require emergency services personnel to be trained; require medical control authority to develop. Amends secs. 20919 & 20965 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919 & 333.20965). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0721'13, SB 0858'14, SB 0860'14
Title
Health; emergency services; protocols that require emergency response vehicles to carry opioid antagonists and require emergency services personnel to be trained; require medical control authority to develop. Amends secs. 20919 & 20965 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919 & 333.20965). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0721'13, SB 0858'14, SB 0860'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 372 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 372 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Same As/Similar To
HB5404 (Same As) 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 312'14 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Health, emergency response
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing), community health
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing), community health