MI HB5404 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 312'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 312'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; emergency services; protocols that require emergency response vehicles to carry opioid antagonists and require emergency services personnel to be trained; require medical control authority to develop. Amends secs. 20919 & 20965 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919 & 333.20965).
Title
Health; emergency services; protocols that require emergency response vehicles to carry opioid antagonists and require emergency services personnel to be trained; require medical control authority to develop. Amends secs. 20919 & 20965 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919 & 333.20965).
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Rep. Joseph Graves [R] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] |
Rep. Henry Yanez [D] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 505 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 505 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 567 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 505 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 567 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 312'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 10:01 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/13/2014 @ 9:32 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:48 Pm |
2014-10-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-01 | House | Roll Call # 505 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2014-10-01 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 567 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 Yeas 109 Nays 1 |
2014-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Amended |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2014-03-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/12/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Hugh Crawford |
Same As/Similar To
SB0859 (Same As) 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Subjects
Health, emergency response
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing), community health
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing), community health