MI SB1099 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0443'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0443'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; certain portion of M-6 in Kent county; designate as the "David Warsen Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 94.
Title
Highways; name; certain portion of M-6 in Kent county; designate as the "David Warsen Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 94.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 683 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 649 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 649 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0443'14 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 4:10 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/27/2014 @ 9:00 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:34 Am |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 683 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Received On 11/06/2014 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 649 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mark Jansen |