MN HF1356 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions for regulation of safe drinking water added.
Title
Definitions for regulation of safe drinking water added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-08 | House | Authors added Hassan and Berg |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2338 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Abeler