MN HF1369 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author added Doepke
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - Author added Doepke
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural offense penalties and remedies imposed.
Title
Agricultural offense penalties and remedies imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Connie Doepke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | House | Author added Doepke |
2011-04-27 | House | Author stricken Dettmer |
2011-04-05 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2011-04-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Policy and Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1369&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1369&version=0&session=ls87 |