MN HF142 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Moran as chief author.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Moran as chief author.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disparity impact analysis of proposed legislation provided, state agencies required to biannually report actions taken to address disparities, and each change item in governor's budget proposal required to include disparity analysis.
Title
Disparity impact analysis of proposed legislation provided, state agencies required to biannually report actions taken to address disparities, and each change item in governor's budget proposal required to include disparity analysis.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Moran as chief author. |
2017-05-21 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-02-02 | House | Authors added Schultz, Pinto, and Bly. |
2017-02-01 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2017-01-12 | House | Authors added Davnie; Dehn, R.; Lee; Mahoney; Slocum. |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF295 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections