MN HF1559 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption provisions modified, safe place for newborns provisions added, child welfare program provisions modified, and Northstar kinship assistance provisions modified.
Title
Adoption provisions modified, safe place for newborns provisions added, child welfare program provisions modified, and Northstar kinship assistance provisions modified.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Robbins |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-01 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1726 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy