MN SF1726 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safe place for newborns, adoption, child welfare program, and Northstar kinship assistance provisions modifications
Title
Safe place for newborns, adoption, child welfare program, and Northstar kinship assistance provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1559 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Hanson, J.