MN HF1684 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Metropolitan Council redistricting provided, and district boundaries adopted.
Title
Metropolitan Council redistricting provided, and district boundaries adopted.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2013-05-06 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1564 |
2013-04-26 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |