MN HF1700 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-20 - Author stricken Davids
Pending: House Labor and Industry Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-20 - Author stricken Davids
Pending: House Labor and Industry Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Nurses at the Bedside Act of 2023; hospital nurse staffing and nurse workload committees requirements established, core staffing plan requirements modified, commissioner required to grade and publicly disclose hospital compliance, hospital preparedness and incident response action plan requirements modified, nursing facility employee scholarship eligibility modified, hospital nursing and health professional education loan forgiveness programs established/modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Keeping Nurses at the Bedside Act of 2023; hospital nurse staffing and nurse workload committees requirements established, core staffing plan requirements modified, commissioner required to grade and publicly disclose hospital compliance, hospital preparedness and incident response action plan requirements modified, nursing facility employee scholarship eligibility modified, hospital nursing and health professional education loan forgiveness programs established/modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | House | Author stricken Davids |
2023-05-19 | House | Author added Berg |
2023-05-16 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2023-05-10 | House | Authors added PĂ©rez-Vega; Noor |
2023-04-19 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Coulter |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Smith |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-03-06 | House | Authors added Jordan; Becker-Finn; Freiberg |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Long |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Her, Norris, Hemmingsen-Jaeger, and Bierman |
2023-02-16 | House | Authors added Kozlowski; Nelson, M.; Elkins; Hornstein; and Hanson, J. |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Davids |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1561 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety