MN SF1561 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Keeping Nurses at the Bedside Act of 2023
Title
The Keeping Nurses at the Bedside Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Sen. John Marty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Labor |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1700 (Similar To) 2023-05-20 - Author stricken Davids