MN HF1740 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol flag program established for families of military service members and first responders who die in the line of duty.
Title
Capitol flag program established for families of military service members and first responders who die in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1659 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy