MN HF2384 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Newton
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Newton
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Sports and Events grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Sports and Events grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author added Newton |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Lillie |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Davids |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2316 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Author added Champion