MN HF2440 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Economic Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LatinoLEAD grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
LatinoLEAD grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Alicia Kozlowski [D] | Rep. Maria Perez-Vega [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] | Rep. Matt Norris [D] |
Rep. Ethan Cha [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Tabke |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2293 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Boldon