MN HF2627 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar on closed landfills funding provided, feasibility analysis required, and money appropriated.
Title
Solar on closed landfills funding provided, feasibility analysis required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ned Carroll [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Larry Kraft [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Kraft; Youakim |
2023-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2294 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Capital Investment