MN HF2724 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Fenton.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Fenton.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School lunch providers prohibited from shaming students, meal policies required to be posted to school websites, and supplementary reserve fund created.
Title
School lunch providers prohibited from shaming students, meal policies required to be posted to school websites, and supplementary reserve fund created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Fenton. |
2018-03-14 | House | Authors added Jessup and Maye Quade. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Bliss and Lillie. |
2018-02-22 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3831 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Referred to E-12 Policy