MN HF2857 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Gruenhagen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Gruenhagen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; absentee or sample ballot application mailing requirements provided for committee or private organization.
Title
Elections; absentee or sample ballot application mailing requirements provided for committee or private organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2022-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Author stricken Vang |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Haley |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Munson |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Nelson, M. |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF3077 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections