MN HF2933 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public employee collective bargaining agreements ratified.
Title
Public employee collective bargaining agreements ratified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 111 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Hillstrom Motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: Hillstrom Motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-02-26 | House | Authors added Youakim and Thissen. |
2018-02-23 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2018-02-22 | House | Amended |
2018-02-22 | House | Second reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 128-0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |